Four Operations

Easy

Medium

Difficult

Q1) 604+52 =
Q1) 705 \(\div\) 5 =
Q1) 88 x 38 =
Q2) 206 - 84 =
Q2) 864 \(\div\) 3 =
Q2) 1808 \(\div\) 2 =
Q3) 954 - 130 =
Q3) 4 x 2 =
Q3) 17 x 67 =
Q4) 325+210 =
Q4) 2 x 17 =
Q4) 36 x 17 =
Q5) 281+71 =
Q5) 9 x 10 =
Q5) 63 x 67 =
Q6) 524 - 507 =
Q6) 730 \(\div\) 10 =
Q6) 17 x 77 =
Q7) 369+493 =
Q7) 716 \(\div\) 4 =
Q7) 1815 \(\div\) 5 =
Q8) 412+901 =
Q8) 468 \(\div\) 4 =
Q8) 1730 \(\div\) 2 =
Q9) 99+251 =
Q9) 2 x 4 =
Q9) 3765 \(\div\) 5 =
Q10) 878 - 807 =
Q10) 876 \(\div\) 4 =
Q10) 1024 \(\div\) 4 =